This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 16:02:58 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC V LINDSEY HULSEY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LINDSEY HULSEY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Crawford, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-64

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

HULSEY, LINDSEY CAYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOGAN, JOSH

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER DUANE

CHAPPELEAR, MEGAN A

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

10/19/2021: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

ORDER OTHER

10/22/2021: ORDER OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED; Entry: NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: NON-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDSEY C HULSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: LINDSEY C HULSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOGAN, JOSH