This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:23:24 (UTC).

CAV SPV I LLC CTBNK NA V GATHINGS

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 CAV SPV I LLC CTBNK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GATHINGS. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1016

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

GATHINGS, DONNA K

Little Rock, AR 72205-4920

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER DUANE

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

08/04/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

11/19/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/13/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

12/14/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Entry: DONNA K GATHINGS NON SERVED- UNABLE TO MAKE CONTACT W/ THE DEFENDANT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: DONNA K GATHINGS SERVED ON 10-25-2021 BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 60PC185421.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BANK OF AMERICA NA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BANK OF AMERICA NA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: BANK OF AMERICA NA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: BANK OF AMERICA NA,

    Read MoreRead Less