This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 16:40:49 (UTC).

CATHY MATTHEW V EDDY MATTHEW -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 CATHY MATTHEW filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDDY MATTHEW -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-259

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW, CATHY L

Defendant

MATTHEW, EDDY JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

MORGAN, ROGER L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/30/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

08/02/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

08/02/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

08/03/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

08/09/2021: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

08/09/2021: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

08/10/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

09/09/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

NOTICE - OTHER

09/29/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/13/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: DECREE OF DIVORCE WITH PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD; Entry: An agreement with regard to property division was read into the record; the divorce was presented as uncontested. Mr. Ezell will submit precedent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT; Entry: Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: Hearing set 1/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT; Entry: ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FOR CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L; Entry: COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT; Entry: EDDY MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: EDDY MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5777.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: EZELL, NICHOLAS SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less