This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 22:29:51 (UTC).

CASSANDRA N PITTS V RYAN A PITTS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CASSANDRA N PITTS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RYAN A PITTS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-73

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITTS, CASSANDRA N

Defendant

PITTS, RYAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARDY, BETTY J

Defendant Attorney

WINNINGHAM, JOE DON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE/REPLY

03/02/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

03/18/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: TEMPORARY HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 2A; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: setting sheet - 3/31/22 at 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: WINNINGHAM, JOE DON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: Response to Complaint for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: HARDY, BETTY J; Entry: RYAN PITTS 2-2-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 23CI22604.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: HARDY, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less