This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 02/10/2022 at 11:27:04 (UTC).

CARTER RENTALS V KOBEY FENNER ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 CARTER RENTALS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KOBEY FENNER ETAL. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LUSBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-309

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LUSBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER RENTALS

Defendants

FENNER, DIANE

FENNER, KOBEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUMPTER, DENNY

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

05/19/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE - OTHER

05/19/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS SERVED

05/27/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

05/27/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER OTHER

06/09/2021: ORDER OTHER

WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/09/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE

06/10/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: SHERFF'S RETURN (POSTED 6/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: IMMEDIATE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FENNER, DIANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FENNER, KOBEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUMPTER, DENNY