This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 13:30:17 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK V DONNIE SAVAGE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONNIE SAVAGE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WYATT, ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-115

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WYATT, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SAVAGE, DONNIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, KEVIN D

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

02/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

04/08/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

04/29/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI2778.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D; Entry: SCRA AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: ROGERS, KEVIN D

    Read MoreRead Less