This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 08:44:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA V JOHN M FERGUSON JR

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN M FERGUSON JR. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Crawford, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-49

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)

Defendant

FERGUSON JR, JOHN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE RENZO, A

WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

03/19/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/27/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

06/11/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: NON-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Entry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: JOHN M FERGUSON JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: JOHN M FERGUSON JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE RENZO, A