This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 11:04:33 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA V SHANNON A THOMPSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANNON A THOMPSON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-434

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

THOMPSON, SHANNON AMBER

Texarkana, AR 71854-2036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

10/14/2022: ANSWER FILED

MOTION DISCOVERY

12/07/2022: MOTION DISCOVERY

ORDER TO DISMISS

12/08/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISCOVERY; Name: SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: THOMPSON, SHANNON AMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI47455.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less