This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 12:09:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA V AMY R THOMAS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMY R THOMAS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are PUTMAN, JOHN and COPELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-56

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

PUTMAN, JOHN

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK N.A.

Defendant

THOMAS, AMY

Mountain Home, AR 72653-5358

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

Defendant Attorney

SUDDUTH, ERIN M.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

02/25/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

07/09/2021: ANSWER FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

JUDGMENT-CONSENT

08/11/2021: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-CONSENT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT; Entry: JOSHUA DERENZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT; Entry: JOSHUA DERENZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: SUDDUTH, ERIN M.; Entry: Answer To Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: CLERK NOTE; Entry: The Preamble filed in the Circuit Courts of the 14th Judicial District of Arkansas, Baxter, Boone, Marion and Newton Counties is recorded as instrument number C202100045 in Baxter County. The Amended Administrative Plan sets out on page two for the Civil Division the following: All Civil Division cases pending in Division 3 on January 1, 2021, shall be reassigned, on a random basis, to either Division 1 or Division 4. If a Civil Division Case is reopened it will be assigned to the Division that heard the case when it was originally filed, except that if the case was originally filed in Division 3 it will be reassigned, on a random basis, to either Division 1 or Division 4. K. Smith, D.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: AMY R THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5107.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT