This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/09/2022 at 09:29:46 (UTC).

BUFFALO LODGE LLC V CASEY LAUGHLIN ET AL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 BUFFALO LODGE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASEY LAUGHLIN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-621

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUFFALO LODGE LLC

Defendants

LAUGHLIN, BETHANY SIERRA

LAUGHLIN, CASEY JAMES

NOBLE, BETHANY BJ SIERRA

Garnishees

WASHINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ARVEST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BROADWAY, ANNA WREN

NORTON, TRAE AARON

Other Attorneys

COZART, ANDREW CARTER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

03/24/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

RETURN OF SERVICE

05/06/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/07/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

05/12/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

05/12/2021: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

05/12/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

06/22/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

MOTION OTHER

06/23/2021: MOTION OTHER

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

06/23/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ORDER GARNISHMENT

06/23/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2021: ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION OTHER

06/30/2021: MOTION OTHER

ORDER GARNISHMENT

07/01/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/27/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: ORDER OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BROADWAY, ANNA WREN; Entry: MOTION FOR ORDER OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Entry: ARVEST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: ORDER OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 72CI74846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: BROADWAY, ANNA WREN; Entry: ARVEST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BROADWAY, ANNA WREN; Entry: MOTION FOR ORDER OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: COZART, ANDREW CARTER; Entry: WASHINGTON REGINAL MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 72CI73808.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: BETHANY S LAUGHLIN ON 04/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 72CI72196.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON; Entry: AFFIDAVIT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON; Entry: COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON; Entry: CASEY J LAUGHLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON; Entry: BETHANY S LAUGHLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: NORTON, TRAE AARON

    Read MoreRead Less