This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 01:28:37 (UTC).

BRITTANY TEDDER V JEREMY TEDDER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 BRITTANY TEDDER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEREMY TEDDER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. AMY D. JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-265

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. AMY D. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TEDDER, BRITTANY LYNN

HURT, BRITTANY LYNN

HURT, BRITTANY L

DURBIN, BRITTANY LYNN

Defendant

TEDDER, JEREMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/26/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

01/26/2021: ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

02/23/2021: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

WAIVER

02/25/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

02/25/2021: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

06/01/2021: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

DEPOSITION

06/02/2021: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

06/07/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: HON. AMY D. JOHNSON - 15TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT; Entry: JEREMY TEDDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT; Entry: BRITTANY TEDDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 60CI418654.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: COSSIO, ROBERTO MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less