This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:09:33 (UTC).

BRADFORD ESTATES, LLC V PRECIOUS DEAN ET AL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 BRADFORD ESTATES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRECIOUS DEAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are HON. CASEY R. TUCKER and HON. PATRICIA ANN JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7443

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

HON. CASEY R. TUCKER

HON. PATRICIA ANN JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATES, BRADFORD

Defendants

DEAN, PRECIOUS

HUGHES, ALEXANDRIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/30/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

12/30/2020: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

12/31/2020: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

12/31/2020: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/31/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/31/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/31/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

01/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

01/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

01/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.

MOTION DISMISS

02/03/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

02/04/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Entry: ORDER TO DISMISS- WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST.; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: PRECIOUS DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: ALEXZANDRIA HUGHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO DISPOSITION OF CASE BY A STATE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $172.50 was made on receipt 60CI416969.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LACY, CHRISTOPHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less