This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 04:35:07 (UTC).

BERTHA MITCHELL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 BERTHA MITCHELL -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-297

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MITCHELL, ROBERT ALTON

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT

Decedent

MITCHELL, BERTHA F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ASKEW, TERRY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/14/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

05/14/2021: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

05/14/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

05/14/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

05/14/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

WAIVER

06/10/2021: WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

06/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

NOTICE - OTHER

10/28/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

01/20/2022: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

01/20/2022: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

PETITION

01/20/2022: PETITION

ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

01/20/2022: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 26CO3244.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: ASCENSION POINT $3535.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 26CO3138.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASKEW, TERRY