This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:14:16 (UTC).

BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA V QUEST IRA INC ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against QUEST IRA INC ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2382

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ERIC COMPTON AND HIS UNKNOWN SPOUSE

COMPTON, ERIC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIC COMPTON

QUEST IRA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

LIS PENDENS

09/15/2022: LIS PENDENS

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

10/07/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

10/07/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/25/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RELEASE OF LIEN

11/02/2022: RELEASE OF LIEN

RELEASE OF LIEN

11/07/2022: RELEASE OF LIEN

MOTION DISMISS

11/07/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

11/08/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE OF LIEN; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE OF LIEN; Entry: REFILED TO CAPTURE INSTRUMENT NUMBER L202271200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: QUEST IRA INC 9/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK; Entry: ERIC COMPTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: ERIC COMPTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Entry: L202260014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: QUEST IRA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: ERIC COMPTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 04CI82427.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less