********2372
09/15/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Foreclosure
Benton, Arkansas
SCHRANTZ
BELLA VISTA VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
UNKNOWN HEIRS IF ANY
MONGAL SR, TRACY NICARDO
HIS UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY
MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $
09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED
09/15/2022: LIS PENDENS
10/07/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER
10/07/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK
10/25/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION
11/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
11/16/2022: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: WARNING ORDER
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK; Entry: TRACY NICARDO MONGAL SR
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Entry: L202260053
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TRACY NICARDO MONGAL SR
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI82405.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read Less