This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:13:59 (UTC).

BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA V FREDERICKS ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FREDERICKS ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHRANTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2380

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCHRANTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLA VISTA PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS IF ANY

PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

FREDERICKS, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

LIS PENDENS

09/15/2022: LIS PENDENS

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

10/20/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

10/20/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

10/20/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/07/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

DECREE OF FORECLOSURE

11/30/2022: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: ANTHONY W FREDRICKS 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: ANTHONY FREDERCIS TRUSTEE OF PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Entry: L202260016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: ANTHONY W FREDERICKS TRUSTEE OF THE PLL SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 04CI82421.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less