********2379
09/15/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Foreclosure
Benton, Arkansas
SCHRANTZ
BELLA VISTA PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS IF ANY
ESTATE OF MARVIN J. DABNER
MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $
09/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED
09/15/2022: LIS PENDENS
10/20/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER
10/20/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK
11/07/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION
11/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
11/29/2022: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: MARVIN J DABNER 10/25/2022
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: WARNING ORDER
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: ESTATE OF MARVIN J DABNER
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Entry: L202260017
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: THE ESTATE OF MARVIN J DABNER
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI82420.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD
[-] Read Less