This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 01/05/2023 at 06:10:07 (UTC).

BEBE BARR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 BEBE BARR -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-154

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSS, LOGAN

Decedent

BARR, BEBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RAGLAND, M. GRANT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/06/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

09/06/2022: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

09/06/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

09/06/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

DEATH CERTIFICATE

09/06/2022: DEATH CERTIFICATE

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

09/06/2022: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

09/06/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

09/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

NOTICE - OTHER

09/08/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

LETTER

09/13/2022: LETTER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/23/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT; Entry: Certificate of Publication - Bebe Barr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT; Entry: DHS no claims letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT; Entry: Notice of Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: [boone co tax collector]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 05CO1390.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT; Entry: Waiver and Entry of Appearance-Hayden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT; Entry: Waiver and Entry of Appearance-Logan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: RAGLAND, M. GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less