This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/01/2023 at 04:19:18 (UTC).

BEATRICE M CHISUM

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 BEATRICE M CHISUM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-199

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REYNOLDS, PAULETTE

Not Yet Classified

CHISUM, DAVID M

CHISUM, PAUL R.

DODGE, WANDA M

Decedent

CHISUM, BEATRICE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDDY, PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

11/15/2022: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

REPORT OF SALE

11/05/2022: REPORT OF SALE

INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

11/05/2022: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

10/31/2022: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

FILING - OTHER

10/27/2022: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

10/27/2022: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

10/27/2022: FILING - OTHER

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

10/27/2022: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

FILING - OTHER

08/23/2022: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

08/23/2022: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

08/23/2022: FILING - OTHER

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/23/2022: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/14/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

07/26/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

07/25/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

CERTIFICATE

07/25/2022: CERTIFICATE

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

07/22/2022: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL ESTATAE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: REPORT OF SALE OF REAL ESTATE LOCATED AT 1338 BOWERS LOOP, DOVER, AR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: INVENTORY OF ESTATE OF DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: REAL ESTATE MARKET EVALUATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: REAL ESTATE MARKET EVALUATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: REAL ESTATE MARKET EVALUATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: AMENDED PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO SELL REAL ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIA CERTIFIED MAIL ON DAVID M. CHISUM, WANDA M. DODGE, AND PAUL R. CHISUM WITH SIGNED RETURN RECEIPTS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBITS 1-3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: REAL ESTATE MARKET EVALUATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO SELL REAL ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SIGNED BY PAULETTE C. REYNOLDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PAULETTE C. REYNOLDS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE, TO SERVE WITHOUT BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF THE DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP; Name: REYNOLDS, PAULETTE; Entry: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BEATRICE M. CHISUM, FILED BY PAULETTE C. REYNOLDS, DAUGHTER OF THE DECEDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: ATTORNEY OF RECORD: PAUL EDDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less