This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 03:42:25 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA V MANTEJBEER SINGH -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANTEJBEER SINGH -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********-100

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA

Defendant

SINGH, MANTEJBEER

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

03/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

05/06/2022: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

05/09/2022: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 9,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16080.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less