This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 10:10:43 (UTC).

AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES V DANNEY ERAKDRIK -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANNEY ERAKDRIK -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is THREET. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-159

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

THREET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

ERAKDRIK, DANNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WITHROW, LORI ELISE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

02/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

MOTION DISMISS

03/15/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER DISMISS PROT ORDER

03/15/2022: ORDER DISMISS PROT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISMISS PROT ORDER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - DANNEY ERAKDRIK NON EST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 72CI82805.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: DANNEY ERAKDRIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less