This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 14:06:24 (UTC).

AURIANNA COATS ETAL V RAYLYNN REDDELL ETAL -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 AURIANNA COATS ETAL filed an Other lawsuit against RAYLYNN REDDELL ETAL -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-356

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COATS JOCELYN, AURIANNA

COATS, ROBERT

Defendant

REDDELL, RAYLYNN

Not Yet Classified and Guardian Ad Litems

COATS, KATHRYN ANNE

REDDELL, JEANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

Defendant Attorneys

DENNISTON, JEANNIE L

ROBBINS, MICHAEL S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/13/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER FILED

07/20/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

08/01/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

08/10/2022: ANSWER FILED

ORDER APPOINT COUNSEL

08/24/2022: ORDER APPOINT COUNSEL

RESPONSE/REPLY

08/25/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

PETITION

08/29/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RESPONSE/REPLY

08/29/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

RESPONSE/REPLY

09/22/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: ROBBINS, MICHAEL S; Entry: RESPONSE TO PETITION TO JOINDER PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 58CI3095.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN; Entry: RESPONSE TO AAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN; Entry: ISSUED TO JEANNA REDDELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN; Entry: PETITION TO JOINDER PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: DENNISTON, JEANNIE L; Entry: REPONSE TO PETITION FOR SIBLING VISITATION BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT COUNSEL; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN; Entry: RESPONSE TO PRE-ANSWER MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR SIBLING VISITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: DENNISTON, JEANNIE L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 58CI2802.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN; Entry: PETITION FOR SIBLING VISITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: ANTESKI, JUNE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less