This case was last updated from Crawford County Arkansas Courts on 06/26/2022 at 01:50:37 (UTC).

ATWOOD RENTALS V CODY HARRIS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 ATWOOD RENTALS filed an Other lawsuit against CODY HARRIS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Arkansas Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-556

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATWOOD RENTALS INC.

Defendant

HARRIS, CODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/18/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

11/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/19/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

NOTICE - OTHER

11/19/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

MOTION TO NON SUIT

01/04/2022: MOTION TO NON SUIT

ORDER TO DISMISS

01/05/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: JUDGE CANDICE SETTLE,; Entry: W/OUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO NON SUIT; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER; Entry: FILED BY ATTY/RONALD BURNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: REPLEVIN TO CODY HARRIS, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO DEFT, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI17185.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER; Entry: FOR DELIVERY; SIGNED BY LEGAL SUPERVISOR/ASHLEY HUTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER; Entry: FOR REPLEVIN & FOR BREACH OF RENTAL PURCHASE AGREEMENT; FILED BY ATTY/RONALD BURNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

    Read MoreRead Less