This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 12/31/2022 at 10:11:12 (UTC).

ASHLEY HUMPHREY V EFRAIN MORAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 ASHLEY HUMPHREY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EFRAIN MORAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-364

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUMPHREY, ASHLEY

Defendant

MORAN, EFRAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/12/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER OTHER

09/22/2022: ORDER OTHER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/22/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/26/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE - OTHER

10/03/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/03/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

11/15/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

RETURN OF SERVICE

11/15/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Room: BOONE COURTROOM; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: FOR JANUARY 30, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 05CI4234.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: proposed Order for Nail and or Hair Follicle Drug Testing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 05CI4217.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: ROBB, JASON MCALLISTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less