This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 02/11/2022 at 12:09:06 (UTC).

ARKANSAS DEPT OF FIN & ADMIN V MATTHEW WARD -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 ARKANSAS DEPT OF FIN ADMIN filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MATTHEW WARD -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-217

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AR DEPT OF FINANCE & ADMIN, LARRY WALTHER, DIRECTOR

Defendant

WARD, MATTHEW

Garnishee

W M RESOURCES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS

06/11/2021: CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

06/11/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

06/28/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

07/26/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER OTHER

07/26/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION DISMISS

08/19/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

08/19/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER FOR GARNISHEE TO RELEASE MONIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: W M RESOURCES INC,; Entry: INTERROGATORIES TO GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: INTERROGATORIES TO GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less