This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 00:03:03 (UTC).

ARK DEPT OF FINANCE V LARRY L DAVIS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 ARK DEPT OF FINANCE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LARRY L DAVIS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RITCHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1-55

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RITCHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

Defendant

DAVIS, LARRY LEE

Garnishees

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

ELDER, TODD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Garnishee and Plaintiff Attorneys

ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

10/20/2021: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

10/20/2021: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

WRIT OTHER ISSUED

10/22/2021: WRIT OTHER ISSUED

MOTION QUASH

11/08/2021: MOTION QUASH

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

11/08/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

LETTER

11/09/2021: LETTER

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

11/22/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/06/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/21/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

01/04/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

01/19/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

02/01/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER OTHER

04/13/2022: ORDER OTHER

LETTER

04/18/2022: LETTER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: FOR GARNISHEE TO RELEASE MONIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD; Entry: ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION - GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD; Entry: ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION - GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: ELDER, MICHAEL TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OTHER ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less