This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 22:00:46 (UTC).

AR RURAL ENDOWMENT FUND V CARL W. VERNON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 AR RURAL ENDOWMENT FUND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARL W VERNON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-528

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS RURAL ENDOWMENT FUND

Defendant

VERNON, CARL W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESKIMEN, CONNIE M

Defendant Attorney

VEACH, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/01/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/01/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE/REPLY

12/30/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

AMENDED ANSWER

01/08/2023: AMENDED ANSWER

NOTICE - OTHER

01/31/2023: NOTICE - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M; Entry: NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S DEATH IN ACCORDANCE WITH A.R.C.P. 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ANSWER; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M; Entry: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Entry: RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MESKIMEN, CONNIE M; Entry: SERVED TO CARL VERNON ON 12/07/2022 @ 12:28PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARL W. VERNON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI3618.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MESKIMEN, CONNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MESKIMEN, CONNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MESKIMEN, CONNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MESKIMEN, CONNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less