This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 06:39:15 (UTC).

AR DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC V MICHAEL ROY BROWN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 AR DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL ROY BROWN. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALE, MILAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-226

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALE, MILAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC

Defendant

BROWN, MICHAEL ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

01/21/2022: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126

01/21/2022: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/08/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/04/2022: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

05/09/2022: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,; Entry: SUMMARY JUDGMENT TOTAL $773.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,; Entry: SERVED-2-11-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 60SW37320.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: ARKANSAS DEMOCRAT GAZETTE INC,

    Read MoreRead Less