This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 07/21/2022 at 18:14:12 (UTC).

APRIL MELVIN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 APRIL MELVIN -NON-TRIAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN and SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-626

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELVIN, FRANCES

Not Yet Classified

MELVIN, APRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNN, TYLER JAMES

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

06/09/2022: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

06/09/2022: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER TRANSFER

06/10/2022: ORDER TRANSFER

ORDER PICK UP ORDER

06/10/2022: ORDER PICK UP ORDER

ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

06/14/2022: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

06/22/2022: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT; Entry: 45 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION; Entry: 7 DAL EVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PICK UP ORDER; Entry: IMMEDIATE DETENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN, TYLER JAMES