This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 03:27:24 (UTC).

ANTIONE WILLIAMS V TABITHA WILLIAMS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 ANTIONE WILLIAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TABITHA WILLIAMS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are AUTREY, WREN and AUTREY, HON L WREN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-196

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

AUTREY, WREN

AUTREY, HON L WREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, ANTIONE DESHAY

Defendant

WILLIAMS, TABITHA DESHAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

WONG, PUI KWAN (KING)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/28/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

05/05/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

05/27/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

05/27/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

05/27/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

LETTER TO COURT

07/02/2021: LETTER TO COURT

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

07/08/2021: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER TO WITHDRAW

07/09/2021: ORDER TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE - OTHER

09/02/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

FILING - OTHER

12/09/2021: FILING - OTHER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

12/10/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: JUDGES NOTES 12-9-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: 12-9-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN; Entry: Notice of Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO WITHDRAW; Entry: COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Name: WONG, PUI KWAN (KING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: WONG, PUI KWAN (KING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: WONG, PUI KWAN (KING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: WONG, PUI KWAN (KING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI41099.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: FRIEDMAN, ERROL NATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less