This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/15/2023 at 18:01:55 (UTC).

ANNELIESE WALTER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 ANNELIESE WALTER -NON-TRIAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1242

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER

Not Yet Classified

WALTER, ANNELIESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNN, TYLER JAMES

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

11/16/2022: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

11/16/2022: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER PICK UP ORDER

11/16/2022: ORDER PICK UP ORDER

ORDER EVALUATION

11/21/2022: ORDER EVALUATION

ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

11/30/2022: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER TO DISMISS

12/02/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EVALUATION; Entry: 7 DAY EVALUTAION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PICK UP ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN, TYLER JAMES