This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 15:07:28 (UTC).

ANDY CUMMINGS V SAMANTHA CHAPMAN-CUMMINGS -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 ANDY CUMMINGS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAMANTHA CHAPMAN-CUMMINGS -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-379

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUMMINGS, ANDY F

OFFICE OF CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

Defendants

CHAPMAN-CUMMINGS, SAMANTHA B

CHAPMAN-CUMMINGS, SAMANTHA BETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY, SETH DAX CAMPBELL

Other Attorneys

COX, LYNN MARIE

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

12/02/2022: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

11/28/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

09/22/2022: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

ORDER ON MTN INTERVENE

09/21/2022: ORDER ON MTN INTERVENE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

09/20/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

09/19/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

MOTION INTERVENE

09/19/2022: MOTION INTERVENE

TEMPORARY ORDER

08/06/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

08/04/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

SUMMONS - SHERIFF

07/28/2022: SUMMONS - SHERIFF

LETTER

07/27/2022: LETTER

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

07/27/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ORDER TRANSFER

07/27/2022: ORDER TRANSFER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

07/25/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER EMERGENCY CUSTODY

07/25/2022: ORDER EMERGENCY CUSTODY

MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION

07/25/2022: MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/22/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: 1-17-23 @ 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE / 11-30-22 @ 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN INTERVENE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER GRANTING INTERVENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED; Name: COX, LYNN MARIE; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION INTERVENE; Name: COX, LYNN MARIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY ORDER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: REVISED-AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S; Entry: PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER SETTING EXPARTE EMRGENCY, TEMPORARY CUSTODY / 8-22-22 @ 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EMERGENCY CUSTODY; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER FOR EXPARTE EMERGENCY, TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S; Entry: EXPARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI2834.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S; Entry: ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: LIBERTY-ELLINGTON, LYNMARIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less