This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 04:34:03 (UTC).

ANDREW CONLEY V KRISTAL CONLEY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 ANDREW CONLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRISTAL CONLEY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DYER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-450

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONLEY, ANDREW ALLEN

Defendants

CONLEY, KRISTAL MICHELLE

HUNT, KRISTAL MICHELLE

ROBERSON, KRISTAL MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOBAUGH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/26/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/26/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

09/23/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

DEPOSITION

09/23/2021: DEPOSITION

LETTER FROM COURT

09/24/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/28/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

LETTER FROM COURT

02/01/2022: LETTER FROM COURT

ORDER OTHER

02/02/2022: ORDER OTHER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

02/02/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II,; Entry: ORDER AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S; Entry: 1-31-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: KRYSTAL CONLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI14780.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: STOBAUGH, JOHN S

    Read MoreRead Less