This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 01:50:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS V WILLIAM WILSON II

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM WILSON II. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-119

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS

Defendant

WILSON II, WILLIAM

Searcy, AR 72143-8900

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASHION EDMISON, CAMILLE M

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

CASHION, CAMILLE M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/10/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/13/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

05/31/2022: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

06/01/2022: ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

MOTION TO NON SUIT

10/10/2022: MOTION TO NON SUIT

ORDER TO DISMISS

10/11/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO NON SUIT; Name: CASHION EDMISON, CAMILLE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: CASHION EDMISON, CAMILLE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less