This case was last updated from White County Courts on 12/12/2022 at 15:09:58 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS V MATTHEW EMBREY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MATTHEW EMBREY. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-303

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS

Defendant

EMBREY, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

Defendant Attorney

HOOD, NICHOLAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

05/26/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/20/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

08/24/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

03/24/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

06/06/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

FILING - OTHER

06/06/2022: FILING - OTHER

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

06/16/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: Release of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Name: HOOD, NICHOLAS ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HOOD, NICHOLAS ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less