This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 20:20:55 (UTC).

AMANDA RANDLE V RANDY RANDLE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 AMANDA RANDLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RANDY RANDLE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-204

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANDLE, AMANDA DAWN

HEFLIN, AMANDA DAWN

Defendant

RANDLE, RANDY G

Intervenor

OFFICE OF CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOBLEY, MARK

Intervenor Attorney

COX, LYNN MARIE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

04/26/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

05/04/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

LETTER

06/16/2022: LETTER

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/28/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: COX, LYNN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: RE:ASSIGNMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT RIGHTS (NO/CS**CH**)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI2362.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MOBLEY, MARK; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less