This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 04:23:31 (UTC).

ALLISON & HANCOCK PROPERTIES V KNM HOLDINGS LLC -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 ALLISON HANCOCK PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KNM HOLDINGS LLC -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1412

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLISON & HANCOCK PROPERTIES

Defendant

KNM HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY, SHANE ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

HOGUE, CURTIS EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/04/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

11/17/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

OBJECTION

11/17/2021: OBJECTION

ANSWER FILED

12/10/2021: ANSWER FILED

MOTION OTHER

12/21/2021: MOTION OTHER

AGREED ORDER

12/27/2021: AGREED ORDER

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

02/22/2022: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

05/16/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 3D; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: 6-14-22 1:30pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: HOGUE, CURTIS EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AGREED ORDER; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,; Entry: AGREED ORDER TERMINATING TENANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 23CI22377.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN; Entry: Joint Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HOGUE, CURTIS EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OBJECTION; Name: HOGUE, CURTIS EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: HOGUE, CURTIS EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN; Entry: KNM HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: HENRY, SHANE ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less