This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 23:27:13 (UTC).

ALISON VALDERRAMA V ERIC VALDERRAMA -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 ALISON VALDERRAMA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ERIC VALDERRAMA -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. ANDREW C. GILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-557

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. ANDREW C. GILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDERRAMA, ALISON

Defendant

VALDERRAMA, ERIC P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE

Defendant Attorneys

BUZBEE, JOHN B.

BURGOS, ALEX R

 

Court Documents

DECREE OF DIVORCE

03/08/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AGREED ORDER

01/12/2022: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

01/06/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

01/04/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/29/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

08/20/2021: MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

07/26/2021: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

07/23/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

07/22/2021: ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

07/21/2021: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

03/30/2021: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

AMENDED ORDER

03/15/2021: AMENDED ORDER

AGREED ORDER

03/15/2021: AGREED ORDER

MOTION CONTINUANCE

03/12/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

03/12/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

03/12/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: HON. ANDREW C. GILL - 9TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BUZBEE, JOHN B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BUZBEE, JOHN B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: EMERGENCY HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 202, 9TH DIVISION; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: HON. ANDREW C. GILL - 9TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 202, 9TH DIVISION; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: HON. ANDREW C. GILL - 9TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AGREED ORDER; Name: HON. ANDREW C. GILL - 9TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: EMERGENCY HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EX PARTE; Entry: EMERGENCY EX PARTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 60CI421100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE; Entry: Complaint for Divorce and Emergency Ex Parte Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: HOOVER, LAUREN WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less