This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/01/2023 at 08:21:54 (UTC).

ADKINS & ASSOCIATES INC V ONE SOURCE FOODS LLC -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 ADKINS ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ONE SOURCE FOODS LLC -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-245

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADKINS & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendant

ONE SOURCE FOODS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

TIDWELL, BRUCE B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/27/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

06/27/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - SHERIFF

08/09/2022: SUMMONS - SHERIFF

MOTION DISMISS

08/29/2022: MOTION DISMISS

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

09/08/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

09/13/2022: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

09/14/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

RESPONSE/REPLY

10/18/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

ORDER OTHER

10/27/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

10/27/2022: ORDER OTHER

ANSWER FILED

11/08/2022: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

11/08/2022: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

11/14/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN; Entry: AMENDED RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING / 10-25-22 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B; Entry: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN; Entry: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: TIDWELL, BRUCE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - SHERIFF; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN; Entry: SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI2749.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LAWS III , IKE ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less