This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 07:00:06 (UTC).

ADAM BLACKMAN V JORDAN BLACKMAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 ADAM BLACKMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JORDAN BLACKMAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-520

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLACKMAN, ADAM HENRY

BLACKMAN, ADAM H

Defendant

BLACKMAN, JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HULL, BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/19/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/19/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

WAIVER

12/01/2021: WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

12/21/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: JUDGE CANDICE SETTLE,; Entry: DIVORCE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF GΠ NO CHILDREN; PROPERTY & DEBTS SET OUT IN THE PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; PARTIES ARE PERMANENTLY ENJOINED FORM INJURING, THREATENING OR HARASSING THE OTHER; CRT RETAINS JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: HULL, BRADLEY; Entry: SIGNED BY PLTF/ADAM BLACKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: HULL, BRADLEY; Entry: SIGNED BY HENRY BLACKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HULL, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: HULL, BRADLEY; Entry: COMPLAINT & SUMMONS TO DEFT ON 11/27 BY CERTIFIED MAIL, FILED BY ATTY BRADLEY HULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: HULL, BRADLEY; Entry: OF SERVICE & ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, SIGNED BY DEFT/JORDAN BLACKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO DEFT, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI17189.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HULL, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HULL, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HULL, BRADLEY; Entry: FOR DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY/BRADLEY HULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: HULL, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less