This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 05:32:49 (UTC).

ABITHA SOUTHARD DYE, DECEASED -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 ABITHA SOUTHARD DYE, DECEASED -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-319

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DODD, BRENDA CHRISTENE

Decedent

DYE, ABITHA

Not Yet Classified

SOUTHARD, TRAVIS C

SOUTHARD, ROBERT C

SOUTHARD, MARTY

MASON, SHERRY

SOUTHARD, ROBBIE

SWITZER, MANDY JEANETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

10/27/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

WAIVER

10/27/2021: WAIVER

DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

10/27/2021: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

10/27/2021: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

10/28/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

10/28/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

10/28/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX

11/01/2021: NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

11/02/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

CONSENT

11/17/2021: CONSENT

CONSENT

11/17/2021: CONSENT

CONSENT

11/17/2021: CONSENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/29/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN; Entry: MANDY SWITZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN; Entry: SHERRY MASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN; Entry: BRENDA C. DODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 03CI6224.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN; Entry: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTANTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less