This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 11:01:39 (UTC).

A MICHELE MAXWELL V DR SARAH KLINE DVM

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 A MICHELE MAXWELL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DR SARAH KLINE DVM. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-915

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAXWELL, A MICHELE

Defendant

KLINE, DR. SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

YOUNG, REGINA ANN

JONES, ALEXANDER TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

06/04/2021: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

06/28/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

07/20/2021: ANSWER FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

07/20/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

TRIAL SCHEDULED

07/21/2021: TRIAL SCHEDULED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

08/17/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

FILING - OTHER

11/18/2021: FILING - OTHER

ORDER TO DISMISS

11/18/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: MAXWELL, A MICHELE; Entry: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: MAXWELL, A MICHELE; Entry: JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: JONES, ALEXANDER TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFER TO CIVIL FROM SC; Entry: PCSC-21-98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: YOUNG, REGINA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: KLINE, DR. SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: SARAH KLINE SERVED ON 6-23-2021 PCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt 60PC182961.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MAXWELL, A MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: MAXWELL, A MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65; Name: MAXWELL, A MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less