This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 01/12/2022 at 19:52:02 (UTC).

2501 JOHN ASHLEY DR LLC V PULASKI CO ASSESSOR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 2501 JOHN ASHLEY DR LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PULASKI CO ASSESSOR -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. WENDELL GRIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7356

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. WENDELL GRIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2501 JOHN ASHLEY DRIVE, LLC

Defendant

WARD WARD, JANET TROUTMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POWELL, MEREDITH AUTUMN

SHANNON, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

SIMMONS, AMANDA ELAINE

FOGLEMAN, ADAM BARRETT

JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/23/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

12/23/2020: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/23/2020: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/23/2020: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/23/2020: EXHIBITS

NOTICE - OTHER

12/23/2020: NOTICE - OTHER

EXHIBITS

12/23/2020: EXHIBITS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/23/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/21/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

01/29/2021: ANSWER FILED

MOTION DISMISS

04/29/2021: MOTION DISMISS

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

04/29/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

RESPONSE/REPLY

05/18/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

RESPONSE/REPLY

05/27/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

LETTER TO COURT

07/13/2021: LETTER TO COURT

MOTION OTHER

07/16/2021: MOTION OTHER

ORDER TO NON SUIT

07/22/2021: ORDER TO NON SUIT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 410, 5TH DIVISION; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: HON. WENDELL GRIFFEN - 5TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: POWELL, MEREDITH AUTUMN; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: POWELL, MEREDITH AUTUMN; Entry: Motion for Voluntary Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM; Entry: FROM PULASKI COUNTY STAFF ATTORNEY, FRANK JENNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM; Entry: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND INCORPORATED BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Response to the Pulaski County Assessor's Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Name: JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: JENNER, FRANK WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Exhibit A to Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Exhibit D to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Exhibit C to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Exhibit B to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL; Entry: Exhibit A to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SHANNON, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less